IL SB0563 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Judicial Quality Act. Requires the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts to develop and implement an ongoing education and training program for judges and relevant court personnel regarding domestic violence or intimate partner violence, child abuse, racial bias in sentencing, cultural competency, lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and gender nonconforming individuals, and the impact of trauma on youth brain development. Provides requirements for the education and training program. Allows the education and training program to be conducted virtually or held through an in-person convening.
Title
JUDICIAL QUALITY ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 011-006-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |