IL SB0563 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Prison Inspection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CRIM-DISORDERLY-THREAT-SCHOOL
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
Sen. John Curran [R] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019 |
2018-11-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-11-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-11-27 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Cunningham |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 135 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |