IL SB0561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Drug Paraphernalia Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-OFFENSES AT CHURCH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-03-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7206001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback