IL SB0559 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LETHAL VIOLENCE ORDER PROTECT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018
2018-02-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2018-02-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-002-000
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255100-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback