IL SB0556 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Fugitive Apprehension Reward Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning rewards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-05-12SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72517016Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback