IL SB0553 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who commits the offense of financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability may be tried in any county in which any part of the assets that the person obtained control over are held. Provides that a defense to aggravated battery of a person 60 years of age or older does not exist merely because the accused reasonably believed the victim to be less than 60 years of age. Enhances the penalties for theft and theft by deception if the victim is 60 years of age or older or a person with a disability or if the offense was committed in a nursing home, an assisted living facility, or a supportive living facility. Provides that theft, theft by deception, and financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability is a Class X felony if the value of the property stolen or illegally obtained exceeds $100,000 (rather than $1,000,000).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

THEFT&EXPLOIT-ELDERLY&DISABLED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-16SenateTo Criminal Law- Clear Compliance
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.05Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-4Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-1Amended CodeCitation Text
720516-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
720517-56Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback