IL SB0553 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-18 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fireworks Regulation Act of Illinois. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning violations of the Act.
Title
FIREARM CONCEALED CARRY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-001-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Forby |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Forby |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
425 | 30 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |