IL SB0534 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a school bus owner may affix to the school bus a sign displaying the fines a driver may incur if the driver passes a school bus while: (i) the school bus is stopped and the stop signal arm is extended; or (ii) the school bus is stopped for the purpose of receiving or discharging pupils. Provides that the sign may be affixed to the back of the school bus or to the stop arm signal.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL BUS-FINE SIGNAGE
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (TR) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=534&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0534.htm |