IL SB0533 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Lowers the flat weight tax for Class C and D vehicles and Class VF farm trucks. Lowers the mileage weight tax for Class MD, ME, MF, and MG vehicles. Lowers the trailer flat weight tax for Class VDD, VDE, and VDG farm trailers. Lowers the flat weight trailer tax of Class TA, TB, TC, TD, and TE trailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-REGISTRATION FEES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Transportation
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Transportation
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-815Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-818Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-819Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback