IL SB0529 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Act. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act, the State Finance Act, and the Public Utilities Act. Authorizes the procurement of renewable energy credits by electric utilities serving more than 300,000 retail customers as of January 1, 2019. Provides for the renewable energy credits to be related to new renewable energy resources installed at the site of electric generation that on January 1, 2019 burned coal as the primary fuel source. Provides for the Illinois Power Agency to manage the procurement of the credits. Establishes the requirements for eligibility for the credits. Requires the electric utilities to file a tariff for the billing and collection of a Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Initiative Charge on each kilowatthour of electricity delivered to its delivery services customers within its service territory at specified rates and to deposit a percentage of its collections in the Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Incentive and Plant Transition Fund. Establishes the Coal to Solar and Energy Storage Incentive and Plant Transition Fund as a special fund in the State treasury to provide transitional support funding to coal-fueled electric utilities participating in the utilization of the renewable energy credits. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-ENERGY EFFICIENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=529&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0529.htm |