IL SB0527 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0532
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the amount paid to the Will County Treasurer from the Tax Recovery Fund to compensate taxing districts for the loss of revenue on real property in Will County that is owned by the State of Illinois for the purpose of developing an airport shall be based on the amount of taxes that would have been extended for the current tax year for the exempt parcel if the parcel had been owned by a person whose property is not exempt (currently, the amount of leasehold taxes extended for the 2002 property tax year). Amends the State Finance Act to provide that compensation from the Tax Recovery Fund shall continue through December 31, 2030 (currently, December 31, 2020). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-WILL CO-LOSS-AIRPORT
Sponsors
Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] |
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0532 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-020-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-004-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |