IL SB0526 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Reenacts a Section of the Code that requires the Department of Children and Family Services to pay the DCFS per diem rate for inpatient psychiatric stay at a free-standing psychiatric hospital effective the 11th day when a child is in the hospital beyond medical necessity, and the parent or caregiver has denied the child access to the home and has refused or failed to make provisions for another living arrangement for the child or the child's discharge is being delayed due to a pending inquiry or investigation by the Department of Children and Family Services. Removes the repeal date for the Section and instead makes the Section inoperative on and after July 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS RATE-PSYCHIATRIC HOSPITAL
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0015 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Effective Date June 14, 2019 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |