IL SB0525 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Modifies defined terms. Provides that determinations of confidential employee status, managerial employee status, and supervisor status shall be based on actual employee job duties and not solely on written job descriptions. Removes provisions placing further requirements on the forming of bargaining units by employees and managerial employees. Removes a provision concerning bargaining unit descriptions. Modifies and provides further requirements for the filing of unit clarification petitions. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LABOR RELATIONS-UNIT STATUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0151
2021-07-23SenateEffective Date July 23, 2021
2021-07-23SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-17SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-20SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-039-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-011-000
2021-05-05HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-30HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2021-04-30HouseArrived in House
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-011-000
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Aquino
2021-04-29SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-006-000
2021-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2021-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2021-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2021-04-23SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-005-000
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Executive
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531521.5Amended CodeCitation Text
53153Amended CodeCitation Text
53159Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback