IL SB0518 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RENEWABLE ENERGY-GREEN ECONOMY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-033-000
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 009-001-000
2017-05-24HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-16HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-001-000
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Link
2017-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 008-000-000
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 008-002-000
2017-03-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-03-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
303301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback