IL SB0516 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIVERBOAT GAMBLING-LAND-BASED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2019-05-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000
2019-05-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 044-005-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-002-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2019-04-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback