IL SB0514 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Railroad Incorporation Act. Makes a technical change in a provision concerning articles of incorporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CAR FACILITATION COMPANY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09SenateSession Sine Die
2018-11-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2019
2018-11-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-11-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-002-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
2018-11-20HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-11-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-06-21HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-05-31HouseArrived in House
2018-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-001
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz
2018-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-001-000
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2018
2018-05-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
61052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback