IL SB0508 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Removes language from the engrossed bill providing that the adjustment shall be made by a supplemental levy. Further amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, in Cook County, an application for judgment and order of sale for the 2018 annual tax sale that would normally be held in calendar year 2020 may not be filed later than October 1, 2021. Provides that no subsequent annual tax sale may begin earlier than 180 days after the last day of the prior delayed tax sale, and no scavenger tax sale may begin earlier than 90 days after the last day of the prior delayed tax sale. Provides that there may be more than 2 consecutive years without a scavenger sales if a tax sale has been delayed as a result of a statewide COVID-19 public health emergency. Provides that, in a county with 275,000 or more inhabitants, for any annual tax sale conducted on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the county collector shall adopt a single bidder rule sufficient to prohibit a tax purchaser from registering more than one related bidding entity at a tax sale. Provides that a county with less than 275,000 inhabitants may adopt a single bidder rule. Provides that, for levy year 2022, the aggregate extension base of a home equity assurance program that levied at least $1,000,000 in property taxes in levy year 2019 or 2020 under the Home Equity Assurance Act shall be the amount that the program's aggregate extension base for levy year 2021 would have been if the program had levied a property tax for levy year 2021. Provides that the county collector may employ an electronic automated bidding system for conducting scavenger tax sales. Amends the Home Equity Assurance Act. Provides that the governing commission of a home equity assurance program that levied at least $1,000,000 in property taxes in levy year 2019 or 2020 may not levy any property tax in levy year 2021. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-PTELL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 5 - May 31, 2021
2021-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 5
2021-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-001
2021-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-05-27SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-05-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-007-000
2021-05-26SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-05-26HouseSuspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-043-000
2021-05-26HouseMoved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris
2021-05-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-20HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-04-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeWitte
2021-04-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2021-04-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-04-07SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Donald P. DeWitte

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
3520018-233New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=508&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0508ham005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0508_04222021_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0508_05312021_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0508ham005_05312021_040001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0508ham002_05312021_040000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback