IL SB0500 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Anatomical Gift Act. Deletes language providing that no hospital, physician and surgeon, procurement organization, or other person shall determine the ultimate recipient of an anatomical gift based upon a potential recipient's physical or mental disability, except to the extent that the physical or mental disability has been found by a physician and surgeon, following a case-by-case evaluation of the potential recipient, to be medically significant to the provision of the anatomical gift. Provides instead that a hospital, physician and surgeon, procurement organization, or other person shall not, solely on the basis of an individual's mental or physical disability: deem an individual ineligible to receive an anatomical gift or organ transplant; deny medical and other services related to organ transplantation, including evaluation, surgery, counseling, postoperative treatment, and services; refuse to refer the individual to a transplant center or other related specialist for the purpose of evaluation for or receipt of an organ transplant; refuse to place an individual on an organ transplant waiting list or place an individual at a lower priority position on the waiting list than the position at which the individual would have been placed if not for the individual's disability; or decline insurance coverage for any procedure associated with the receipt of the anatomical gift, including posttransplantation care. Provides that a hospital, physician and surgeon, procurement organization, or other person may take an individual's disability into account when making treatment or coverage recommendations or decisions solely to the extent that the physical or mental disability has been found by a physician or surgeon, following an individualized evaluation of the potential recipient, to be medically significant to the provision of the anatomical gift.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANATOMICAL GIFTS-DISABILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-03-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
2021-03-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 008-000-000
2021-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
755504.5Amended CodeCitation Text
755505-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback