IL SB0486 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Simplified Municipal Telecommunications Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SOLAR ENERGY SYSTEMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-05-29HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2018-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon
2018-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 009-000-000
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading June 29, 2017
2017-06-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
356365-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=486&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0486ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0486_05032018_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0486_05302018_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0486ham004_05312018_010001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0486ham003_05312018_010000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback