IL SB0482 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Energy Conservation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PILOT PROGRAM-COOK CO-EXPUNGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0306
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2019
2019-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2019-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-26HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 017-000-000
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-04-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins
2019-03-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 008-001-000
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Criminal Law
2019-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2019-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2019-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-07SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2011151Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=482&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0482.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0482eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0482enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0306.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0482sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0482ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0482_04042019_022000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0482_05262019_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0482ham001_05312019_024000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback