IL SB0481 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act, the Illinois Vehicle Code, the Snowmobile Registration and Safety Act, the Boat Registration and Safety Act, the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act, the Cannabis Control Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that certain fees, assessments, fines, and funds collected relating to the State Police shall be remitted to the State Treasurer for deposit into the appropriate fund or distribution to the appropriate entity. Repeals the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act and the Section of the Clerks of Courts Act pertaining to court fees on January 1, 2026 (rather than 2022). Effective immediately.
Title
COURTS-FEES-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Steve McClure [R] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0145 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date July 23, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 40 | 5-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 5-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 16-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 15-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 20-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 550 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |