IL SB0473 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Direct Pay Permit Implementation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section creating the direct pay permit pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-HOMESTEAD EXEMPTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0401
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 048-001-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 012-002-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-024-000
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-05-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-002
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz
2017-05-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351605Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=473&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0401.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0473ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0473_05042017_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0473_05252017_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0473_05312017_086000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback