IL SB0472 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Economic Development for a Growing Economy Tax Credit Act. Provides that certain startup taxpayers are eligible to elect to claim the Credit against their obligation to pay over withholding taxes. Makes changes to the definition of "underserved area" to change certain references from the federal decennial census to the American Community Survey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDGE TX CR-STARTUP TAXPAYERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-25HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2022-01-27HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2022-01-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2021-05-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-03-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35105-15Amended CodeCitation Text
35105-20Amended CodeCitation Text
35105-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback