IL SB0471 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0144
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Network Adequacy and Transparency Act. Sets forth provisions concerning timely and proximate access to treatment for mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions. Provides that network adequacy standards for timely and proximate access to treatment for mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions must satisfy specified minimum requirements. Provides that if there is no in-network facility or provider available for an insured to receive timely and proximate access to treatment for mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions in accordance with the minimum network adequacy standards, the insurer shall provide necessary exceptions to its network to ensure admission and treatment with a provider or at a treatment facility in accordance with those network adequacy standards. Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the medical assistance program shall be subject to provisions of the Network Adequacy and Transparency Act concerning timely and proximate access to treatment for mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions. In provisions concerning network adequacy and transparency, provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require managed care organizations to comply with provisions of the Network Adequacy and Transparency Act concerning timely and proximate access to treatment for mental, emotional, nervous, or substance use disorders or conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
NETWORK ADEQUACY/TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] |
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0144 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 017-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 370c | Amended Code | Citation Text |