IL SB0456 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0531
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-EMPLOYMENT-OFFENDERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0531
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-05-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000
2019-05-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney
2019-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Steven Reick
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2019-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-11SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2019-04-11SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-05SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2019-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11551Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=456&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0456.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0456eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0456enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0531.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0456sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0456ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0456ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0456_04112019_045000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB0456_05282019_018000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0456ham002_05302019_030001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB0456ham001_05302019_030000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback