IL SB0454 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INDIVIDUALIZED EDUCATION PGM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 048-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4 - May 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 4
2018-05-31HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-013-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 017-000-000
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2018-04-19SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-03-22SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115520Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=454&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0454ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0454_04242018_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0454_05312018_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0454ham004_05312018_074000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback