IL SB0453 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. With regard to local school council members, provides that an individual is ineligible for election or appointment to a local school council if he or she appears on the Dru Sjodin National Sex Offender Public Website or the Statewide Sex Offender Database or Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database. Provides that if the general superintendent, upon a check, determines at any time that a local school council member or member-elect appears on the Dru Sjodin National Sex Offender Public Website or the Statewide Sex Offender Database or Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database, the general superintendent must notify the local school council member or member-elect of such determination and the local school council member or member-elect must be removed from the local school council by the school board, subject to a hearing, convened pursuant to board rule, prior to removal. Provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, a local school council member must comply with all applicable board rules and policies regarding employees or volunteers if he or she engages in school activities beyond the scope of his or her official duty as a council member. Removes provisions regarding ineligibility for election or appointment of a local school council member based on a criminal conviction.
Title
SCH CD-SCHOOL COUNCIL-OFFENDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-10 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-01-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-01-31 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-01-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-01-13 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-01-13 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-05-09 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 005-002-000 |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-019-000 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-004-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 26 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |