IL SB0452 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0921
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Open Meetings Act to collective bargaining negotiations and grievance arbitrations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRUSTEES OF SCHOOLS-LYONS TWP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0921
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date August 17, 2018
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 050-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-05-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2018-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
115518Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=452&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0452.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0452eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0452enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0921.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0452sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0452ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0452_05252018_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0452_05312018_005000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0452ham001_05312018_067000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback