IL SB0451 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning estimated billing practices.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 8-304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |