IL SB0449 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL-PERFORMANCE EVALUATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
2017-05-18SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2017-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-02SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110491Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback