IL SB0446 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Construction Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning referendum requirements.
Title
SCH CD-STATE AID-WEIGHTING
Sponsors
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Arthur Turner [D] |
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 20 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 060-055-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-31 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-05-30 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-008-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-29 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-05-29 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-05-24 | House | Remains in Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 010-006-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-020-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-002-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 230 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |