IL SB0440 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Makes technical changes in a Section relating to the alternative (State Police) formula.
Title
PEN CD-CHICAGO FIRE-TIER 2
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-29 - House - Motion in House (Y: 81 N: 31 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-16 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 39 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0905 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Effective Date November 29, 2016 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2016-11-29 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 081-031-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-28 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-11-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2016-11-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 037-015-000 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2016 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Motion Withdrawn Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 039-015-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-003-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-024-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-004-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-05-19 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |