IL SB0427 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Facility Lease Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
METROPOLITAN PIER EXPO BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Motion in House (Y: 78 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1116 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2018-11-28 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 078-033-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 047-004-001 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-048-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-005-001 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 615 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |