IL SB0426 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES-PREDICTABLE FEE SCHED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
2018-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-31HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-004-000
2018-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-29HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-23HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-19HouseArrived in House
2018-04-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2018-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-000-000
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-02-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 7, 2018
2018-02-06SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5551-1001Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback