IL SB0422 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TWP CD-GOODS FROM GOVT AGENCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-033-000
2017-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-001-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6551-1-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback