IL SB0420 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0895
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0895
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the payment of support to the State Disbursement Unit.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0895 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2016-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-10.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |