IL SB0418 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Library System Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Local Government |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 10 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |