IL SB0417 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning supportive living facilities.
Title
PUB AID-LONG-TERM SERVICES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2015-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Collins |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.01a | Amended Code | Citation Text |