IL SB0407 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Salaries Act. Makes a technical change in the Section concerning the short title.
Title
COMMISSION POLICE PROFESSIONAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1155 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Effective Date December 19, 2018 |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-11-28 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-11-20 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-11-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-11-14 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sims |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2018 |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 290 | 0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |