IL SB0405 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0698
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Electronic Legal Material Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT/EDGE-HARASSMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0698
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-007-001
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-27HouseArrived in House
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson
2018-04-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 006-000-000
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-09SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-04-04SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51801Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback