IL SB0398 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Economic Development Act of 2017. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-01-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-01-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-01-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-04-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback