IL SB0355 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section regarding Medicaid co-payments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC AID-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Human Services
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-09SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback