IL SB0351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the "Medicaid" Article.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SNAP-ELIGIBILITY-STUDENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-09 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-09SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-09SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2018-05-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 2, 2018
2018-04-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-11-10HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-11-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2017-11-07HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-11-06HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-11-06HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-10-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-25HouseArrived in House
2017-10-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
2017-10-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison
2017-10-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-10-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2017-10-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-10-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-10-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-18SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback