IL SB0349 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Children and Family Services, for grants to the Court Appointed Special Advocates of Cook County to advocate for the timely placement of children in permanent, safe, and stable homes. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$DCFS-CASA-COOK COUNTY
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] |
Sen. Celina Villanueva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=349&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB0349.pdf |