IL SB0346 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0095
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0095
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall administer and regulate a school-based dental program that allows for the out-of-office delivery of preventative dental services in a school setting to children under 19 years of age. Provides that the Department shall establish, by rule, guidelines for participation by providers and set requirements for follow-up referral care based on the requirements established in the Dental Office Reference Manual published by the Department that establishes the requirements for dentists participating in the All Kids Dental School Program. Provides that every effort shall be made by the Department when developing the program requirements to consider the different geographic differences of both urban and rural areas of the State for initial treatment and necessary follow-up care. Provides that no provider shall be charged a fee by any unit of local government to participate in the school-based dental program administered by the Department. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act shall be construed to limit or preempt a home rule unit's or school district's authority to establish, change, or administer a school-based dental program in addition to, or independent of, the school-based dental program administered by the Department. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
MEDICAID DENTAL COVERAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0095 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Morrison |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 004-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Medicaid |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.28 | New Code | See Bill Text |