IL SB0346 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning refusal of services and informing of risks.
Title
MEDICAL CANNABIS PILOT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-03 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Substance Abuse Special; 007-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 067-048-000 |
2016-05-30 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Substance Abuse Special; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-05-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-29 | House | Assigned to Substance Abuse Special |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | First Reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-011-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-001-001 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 2-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |