IL SB0339 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Provides that for State fiscal years 2022 and 2023, the Department of Human Services shall increase reimbursement rates for early intervention services and related services by 4% each State fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-EARLY INTERVENTION RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-03-03 | Senate | To Appropriations- Human Services |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=339&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0339.htm |