IL SB0339 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Hearing Instrument Consumer Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers of the circuit court.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 50 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |