IL SB0339 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Hearing Instrument Consumer Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers of the circuit court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-27SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2255025Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback