IL SB0338 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Treasurer Act. Repeals provisions regarding transfer of power; transfer of personnel; transfer of property; and rules and standards. Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Changes the definition of "virtual currency". Provides that a money order is presumed abandoned if it is unclaimed by the apparent owner 3 (rather than 7) years after issuance. Provides that virtual currency is presumed abandoned if it is unclaimed by the apparent owner 5 years after the last indication of interest in the property. Provides that a business association who has no reportable property shall so report to the administrator under specified circumstances. Provides that the administrator does not need to notify the Department of Revenue of the names or social security numbers of apparent owners of abandoned property if the administrator reasonably believes that the Department of Revenue will be unable to provide information that would provide sufficient evidence to establish that the person in the Department of Revenue's records is the apparent owner of unclaimed property in the custody of the administrator. Includes a provision regarding identification of apparent owners of abandoned property using other State databases. Provides that if property reported to the administrator is virtual currency, the holder shall liquidate the virtual currency and remit the proceeds to the administrator. Makes changes to provisions regarding: when tax-deferred and tax-exempt retirement accounts presumed abandoned; United States savings bonds; crediting income or gain to owner's account; and action by a person whose claim is denied.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RUUPA-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 042-017-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 042-017-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 005-002-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 005-002-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3, 4
2021-05-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-043-000
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-05-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-007-000
2021-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-13HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-006-000
2021-05-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-018-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 005-002-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-03-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-19SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-19SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
155050.02Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.03Amended CodeCitation Text
155050.04Repealed CodeCitation Text
155050.05Repealed CodeCitation Text
765102615-102Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-201Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-202Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-213Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-401Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-503Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-603Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-607Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-906Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=338&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0338ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0338_04212021_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0338_05272021_009000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0338ham004_05302021_049001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0338ham003_05302021_049000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback